Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Sequeira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chikmagalur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1930Born
15 Apr 195827.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 198756.5AppointedBishop of Chikmagalur, India
11 Jun 198756.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chikmagalur, India
2 Dec 200676.4RetiredBishop of Chikmagalur, India
9 Oct 201989.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chikmagalur, India

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Sequeira
Bishop John Baptist Sequeira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chikmagalur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMangalore, Diocese of Mangalore
Ordained BishopChikmagalur, Diocese of Chikmagalur
Death PlaceLittle Sisters of the Poor, Bangalore, Archdiocese of Bangalore

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,254
  • d: CB, 10 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 10 Oct 2019

Quantcast