Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Gaspar Lagwen

Bishop of Mbulu, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1967 Born
18 Oct 199932.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mbulu, Tanzania
22 May 201850.8AppointedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
12 Aug 201851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Anthony Gaspar Lagwen
Bishop Anthony Gaspar Lagwen (born ) Bishop of Mbulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTlawi, Diocese of Mbulu
Ordained BishopOutdoors, near, Cathedral, Mbulu, Diocese of Mbulu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbulu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2018
  • mn/ob: CB, 14 Jul 2018
  • c2+: CB, 12 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Aug 2018

Quantcast