Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Moshi

Dioecesis Moshiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Isaac Amani Massawe, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
13 September 1910ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro (erected)
28 January 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bagamoyo
Prefecture Apostolic of Iringa
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Dodoma (erected)
14 April 1943Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Dodoma
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
Prefecture Apostolic of Mbulu (erected)
18 April 1950Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro Prefecture Apostolic of Tanga (erected)
Diocese of Moshi
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro Diocese of Moshi
1 March 1963Territory LostDiocese of Moshi Diocese of Arusha (erected)
10 December 1963Territory LostDiocese of Moshi Prefecture Apostolic of Same (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro
194976,023700,00010.9%1347601,2671376ap1951
Diocese of Moshi
1970290,330500,80158.0%41681092,6639140125ap1971
1980432,777803,67653.8%94191133,8293769534ap1981
1990592,386878,77567.4%111231344,4206790040ap1991
1999753,0281,306,20057.7%204302343,218861,04243ap2000
2000754,2151,300,46758.0%131321634,627831,05345ap2001
2001786,5601,235,53063.7%129271565,042931,08548ap2002
2002802,4821,323,61760.6%128441724,66512199450ap2003
2003593,8311,053,04856.4%132411733,4321371,10350ap2004
2004575,249881,37665.3%135441793,2131391,11752ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013