Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hency Martínez Vargas

Bishop of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1958 Born
10 Jun 198527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bucaramanga, Colombia
7 Jul 198729.3IncardinatedPriest of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia
13 Jan 201960.8AppointedBishop of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia
21 Mar 201961.0Ordained BishopBishop of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia
4 Apr 201961.1InstalledBishop of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hency Martínez Vargas
Bishop Hency Martínez Vargas (born ) Bishop of La Dorada-Guaduas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga
Ordained BishopInmaculada Concepcion, Cathedral, Málaga, Diocese of Málaga-Soatá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Dorada-Guaduas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 13 Jan 2019
  • ob.loc: CB, 14 Jan 2019
  • c2: CB, 19 Feb 2019
  • c34: CB, 15 Mar 2019
  • c4: CB, 21 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast