Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ovidio Giraldo Velásquez

Bishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1963 Born
18 Feb 198926.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Dorada-Guaduas, Colombia
29 May 202057.3AppointedBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
22 Jul 202057.4Ordained BishopBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
8 Aug 202057.5InstalledBishop of Barrancabermeja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ovidio Giraldo Velásquez
Bishop Ovidio Giraldo Velásquez (born ) Bishop of Barrancabermeja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontebonito
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Pobreza, Cathedral, Pereira, Diocese of Pereira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barrancabermeja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 May 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 2 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Aug 2020

Quantcast