Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Ángel Arce Vivas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1904Born
11 Jun 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Popayán, Colombia
31 Oct 196460.6AppointedBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
27 Dec 196460.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ipiales, Colombia
7 Apr 196561.0AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
11 Oct 197672.6ResignedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
27 May 198783.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ángel Arce Vivas
Archbishop Miguel Ángel Arce Vivas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlacePopayán, Archdiocese of Popayán
Ordained BishopCathedral, Popayán, Archdiocese of Popayán

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 24
  • mn: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast