Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Esteban y Gómez

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1766BornAlustante
29 Sep 181447.8SelectedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
19 Dec 181448.1ConfirmedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
19 Feb 181548.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
22 Jul 181649.7AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
17 Jun 183164.6DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Esteban y Gómez:
Bishop Andrés Esteban y Gómez (born , died ) Bishop of Jaén

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 4
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 204, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 130, Number 696

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015