Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Donato Negro

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1948 Born
15 Jul 197224.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 199345.9AppointedBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
10 Feb 199446.1Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Ruvo-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
29 Apr 200052.3AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
24 Jun 200052.4InstalledArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Donato Negro
Archbishop Donato Negro (born ) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Cesario di Lecce

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Otranto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast