Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eurico Kršutler, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Xingu, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1906Born
10 Jul 193225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
26 Apr 197164.7AppointedPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
26 Apr 197164.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissa
27 Jun 197164.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissa
26 May 197871.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Cissa
2 Sep 198175.0RetiredPrelate of Xingu, Para, Brazil
2 Jan 198679.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of Xingu, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eurico Kršutler
Bishop Eurico Kršutler C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Xingu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoblach, Austria
Ordained BishopSt-Nicolas, Cathedral, Feldkirch, Diocese of Feldkirch, Austria

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 847

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast