Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis William Markall, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salisbury, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1905Born
9 Sep 193731.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
29 Apr 195650.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
29 Apr 195650.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cotyaeum
8 Sep 195650.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cotyaeum
23 Nov 195651.1SucceededArchbishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
31 May 197670.6ResignedArchbishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
9 Aug 199286.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salisbury, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Francis William Markall
Archbishop Francis William Markall S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salisbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHarringay, Great Britain

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast