Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donal Raymond Lamont, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Umtali, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1911Born
11 Jul 193725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
6 Feb 195341.5AppointedPrefect of Umtali, Zimbabwe
15 Feb 195745.5AppointedBishop of Umtali, Zimbabwe
16 Jun 195745.8Ordained BishopBishop of Umtali, Zimbabwe
5 Nov 198170.2ResignedBishop of Umtali, Zimbabwe
14 Aug 200392.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Umtali, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Donal Raymond Lamont
Bishop Donal Raymond Lamont O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Umtali

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallycastle, Ireland

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Feb 2017