Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexius Obabu Makozi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Port Harcourt, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1932Born
8 Dec 196129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lokoja, Nigeria
20 Feb 197139.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lokoja, Nigeria
20 Feb 197139.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Fallaba
30 May 197139.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fallaba
30 Jul 197240.4AppointedBishop of Lokoja, Nigeria
31 Aug 199159.5AppointedBishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
4 May 200977.2RetiredBishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
16 Jan 201683.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Port Harcourt, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Alexius Obabu Makozi (VIAF: 9230231)
Bishop Alexius Obabu Makozi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Port Harcourt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOkene
Ordained BishopOkene

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2009
  • d: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2,017, Number 16
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 961

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast