Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Ebosele Ekpu

Archbishop Emeritus of Benin City, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1931 Born
7 Jul 196331.6Ordained PriestPriest of Benin City, Nigeria
5 Jun 197139.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Benin City, Nigeria
5 Jun 197139.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
21 Nov 197140.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
5 Jul 197341.6SucceededBishop of Benin City, Nigeria
26 Mar 199462.4AppointedArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria
21 Nov 200675.0RetiredArchbishop of Benin City, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Patrick Ebosele Ekpu (VIAF: 9135953)
Archbishop Patrick Ebosele Ekpu (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benin City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUromi
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Benin City, Diocese of Benin City

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Benin City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 841

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast