Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Duding, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1643Born
1 Aug 170763.9AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
4 Nov 170865.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
20 Nov 171673.2DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jacques Duding
Bishop Jacques Duding O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiaz

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast