Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César de Sabran

Deceased

Bishop of Glandèves


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornAiguines
3 Jun 170260.4SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
25 Sep 170260.7ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
30 Nov 170260.9Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
19 Jun 172078.4DiedBishop of Glandèves, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for César de Sabran:
Bishop César de Sabran (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Glandèves

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jun 2015