Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Goyon de Matignon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Condom, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
5 Apr 167027.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 167128.8SelectedBishop of Condom, France
22 Feb 167229.1ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
16 Apr 167330.2Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
1693²50.0ResignedBishop of Condom, France
15 Mar 172784.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Condom, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Goyon de Matignon
Bishop Jacques de Goyon de Matignon (born 1643, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Condom

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorigni-sur-Vire

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 53.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast