Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis John Spence

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1926Born
16 Apr 195023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
1 Apr 196740.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canada, Military
1 Apr 196740.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
15 Jun 196741.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova
17 Aug 197044.2AppointedBishop of Charlottetown, Prince Edward Island, Canada
14 Mar 198255.7AppointedBishop of Canada, Military
24 Apr 198255.8AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
30 Jun 198256.0InstalledArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
28 Oct 198761.4ResignedBishop of Canada, Military
27 Apr 200275.8RetiredArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
27 Jul 201185.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Francis John Spence
Archbishop Francis John Spence (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerth

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018