Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valéry Vienneau

Archbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1947 Born
29 Aug 198234.8Ordained PriestPriest of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
3 Jul 200254.7AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
8 Oct 200254.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
15 Jun 201264.6AppointedArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada
29 Aug 201264.8InstalledArchbishop of Moncton, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Valéry Vienneau
Archbishop Valéry Vienneau (born ) Archbishop of Moncton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCap-Pelé

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Moncton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,274
  • i: CB, 25 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast