Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ciriaco Benavente Mateos

Bishop Emeritus of Albacete, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1943 Born
4 Jun 196623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Plasencia, Spain
17 Jan 199249.0AppointedBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
22 Mar 199249.2Ordained BishopBishop of Coria-Cáceres, Spain
16 Oct 200663.7AppointedBishop of Albacete, Spain
16 Dec 200663.9InstalledBishop of Albacete, Spain
25 Sep 201875.7RetiredBishop of Albacete, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ciriaco Benavente Mateos
Bishop Ciriaco Benavente Mateos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Albacete

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalpartida de Plasencia
Ordained BishopCathedral, Coria, Diocese of Coria-Cáceres

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albacete.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,663
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 25 Sep 2018

Quantcast