Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmelo Echenagusia Uribe

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bilbao

Titular Bishop of Auzegera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1932BornYurreta
29 Jun 195523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bilbao, Spain
8 Sep 199563.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bilbao, Spain
8 Sep 199563.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzegera
9 Nov 199563.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzegera
5 Feb 200875.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bilbao, Spain
6 Nov 200876.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bilbao, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carmelo Echenagusia Uribe:
Bishop Carmelo Echenagusia Uribe (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bilbao

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Feb 2008
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,632
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013