Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Eudes Campos do Nascimento

Bishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1966 Born
15 Aug 199428.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Apr 199528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Jun 201246.1AppointedBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Sep 201246.3Ordained BishopBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 Sep 201246.4InstalledBishop of Leopoldina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Dec 201852.6AppointedBishop of São João del Rei, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Eudes Campos do Nascimento
Bishop José Eudes Campos do Nascimento (born ) Bishop of São João del Rei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbacena, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Nossa Senhora da Piedade, Barbacena, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São João del Rei.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2012
  • od/c01: CB, 27 Jun 2012
  • ob/i: CB, 8 Jul 2012
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,541
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Dec 2018

Quantcast