Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valdemir Ferreira dos Santos

Bishop of Amargosa, Bahia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1960 BornItajaí de Nova Canaã
6 Sep 198727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
17 Mar 201049.9AppointedBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
30 May 201050.1Ordained BishopBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
4 May 201656.0AppointedBishop of Amargosa, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Valdemir Ferreira dos Santos
Bishop Valdemir Ferreira dos Santos (born ) Bishop of Amargosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Amargosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,651
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 May 2016