Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Ignace de La Ville

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1702BornSainte Marie de Gosse, France
28 Feb 177471.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
10 Apr 177471.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
15 Apr 177471.5DiedTitular Bishop of Tricomia

MicroData Summary for Jean Ignace de La Ville:
Bishop Jean Ignace de La Ville (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tricomia

  • a bishop for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015