Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Martín Janiz (Yáñez) y Paz

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1840Born
4 Nov 186626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
7 Feb 191069.2AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
8 May 191069.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
17 May 191069.5InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
6 Apr 192685.4DiedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Martín Janiz (Yáñez) y Paz
Bishop Juan Martín Janiz (Yáñez) y Paz (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago del Estero

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast