Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zenón Bustos y Ferreyra, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1850BornCórdoba
24 Dec 187423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Mar 190554.1AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
25 Apr 190554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
28 Apr 190554.3InstalledBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
13 Apr 192574.2DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Zenón Bustos y Ferreyra:
Bishop Zenón Bustos y Ferreyra O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015