Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Constance de Lort de Sérignan de Valras

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1690BornBéziers
27 Jan 173241.4SelectedBishop of Mâcon, France
9 Jun 173241.8ConfirmedBishop of Mâcon, France
27 Jul 173241.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mâcon, France
8 Nov 176373.2DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Constance de Lort de Sérignan de Valras:
Bishop Henri-Constance de Lort de Sérignan de Valras (born , died ) Bishop of Mâcon

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015