Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco-Javier Lozano Sebastián

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Romania

Titular Archbishop of Penafiel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1943 Born
19 Mar 196824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
9 Jul 199450.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Penafiel
9 Jul 199450.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tanzania
25 Jul 199450.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Penafiel
20 Mar 199955.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
200157.0AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
4 Aug 200359.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Croatia
10 Dec 200764.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
10 Dec 200764.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Moldova, Republic of
20 Jul 201571.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
20 Jul 201571.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Moldova, Republic of

MicroData Summary for Francisco-Javier Lozano Sebastián (VIAF: 3819091)
Archbishop Francisco-Javier Lozano Sebastián (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Romania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillaverde de Íscar, Diocese of Segovia, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Romania.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,355
  • r: CB, 3 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast