Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlos Cardinal Amigo Vallejo, O.F.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Monserrato degli Spagnoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1934 Born
17 Aug 196025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Dec 197339.3AppointedArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
28 Apr 197439.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
22 May 198247.7AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Jun 198247.8InstalledArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
21 Oct 200369.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200369.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Monserrato degli Spagnoli
5 Nov 200975.2RetiredArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Amigo Vallejo (VIAF: 60476725)
Carlos Cardinal Amigo Vallejo O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedina de Rioseco
Ordained BishopSan Francisco al Grande, Madrid

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,310

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 6 Jul 2020

Quantcast