Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Nlandu Mayi

Bishop of Matadi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1953 BornKinshasa
20 Apr 198026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Oct 199946.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Oct 199946.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
30 Jan 200046.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas
11 Nov 200855.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Sep 201056.9SucceededBishop of Matadi, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Daniel Nlandu Mayi:
Bishop Daniel Nlandu Mayi (born ) Bishop of Matadi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Matadi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,691
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013