Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edouard Kisonga Ndinga, S.S.S.

Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Grumentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1946 Born
7 Jun 198135.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
29 Oct 199953.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Oct 199953.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Grumentum
30 Jan 200053.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Grumentum

MicroData Summary for Edouard Kisonga Ndinga
Bishop Edouard Kisonga Ndinga S.S.S. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKisantu

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kinshasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,692
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast