Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Bulamatari

Bishop of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1955 Born
20 Apr 198024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Oct 199944.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Oct 199944.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania
30 Jan 200044.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elephantaria in Mauretania
14 Nov 200954.4AppointedBishop of Molegbe, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Dominique Bulamatari
Bishop Dominique Bulamatari (born ) Bishop of Molegbe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Molegbe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,693
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast