Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Maria Careggio

Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1937 BornMazzč
26 Jun 196628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Aosta, Italy
4 Aug 199557.7AppointedBishop of Chiavari, Italy
24 Sep 199557.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiavari, Italy
20 Mar 200466.4AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
9 May 200466.5InstalledBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
25 Jan 201476.2RetiredBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Maria Careggio:
Bishop Alberto Maria Careggio (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia-San Remo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ventimiglia-San Remo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,614
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Jan 2014