Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alain Guynot de Boismenu, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Papua

Titular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1870BornSt-Malo, France
10 Feb 189524.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
10 Jun 189928.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of New Guinea
10 Jun 189928.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
18 Mar 190029.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
Jan 190837.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of New Guinea
18 Jan 194574.1RetiredVicar Apostolic of Papua, Papua New Guinea
18 Jan 194574.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
5 Nov 195382.9DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Papua, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Alain Guynot de Boismenu:
Archbishop Alain Guynot de Boismenu M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Papua

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 53.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013