Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando de Souza Monteiro, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1866Born
22 Mar 189023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Aug 190134.9AppointedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
13 Oct 190135.0Ordained BishopBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil
23 Mar 191649.5DiedBishop of Espírito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando de Souza Monteiro
Bishop Fernando de Souza Monteiro C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Espírito Santo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCachoeiro de Itapemirim

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 526
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast