Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard Pieschl

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Limburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Misenum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1934 Born
8 Dec 196127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
24 Aug 197743.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Limburg, Germany
24 Aug 197743.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Misenum
23 Oct 197743.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Misenum
15 Jun 200975.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard Pieschl
Bishop Gerhard Pieschl (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Limburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoravská Trebová

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast