Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amadeo Rodríguez Magro

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1946 BornSan Jorge de Alor
14 Jun 197024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Plasencia, Spain
3 Jul 200357.3AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
31 Aug 200357.4Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
9 Apr 201670.0AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Amadeo Rodríguez Magro
Bishop Amadeo Rodríguez Magro (born ) Bishop of Jaén

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jaén.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,446
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Apr 2016