Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Patau

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne

Titular Bishop of Torone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1864BornBolquère
1888²23.6Ordained PriestPriest of Perpignan-Elne, France
1 May 192560.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
1 May 192560.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Torone
2 Jul 192561.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Torone
29 Dec 193268.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
6 Mar 194176.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Patau:
Bishop Pierre Patau (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015