Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Jules-Narcisse Rémond

Deceased

Bishop of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1873BornSalins
30 Jul 189925.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 192147.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Clysma
29 May 192147.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clysma
20 May 193056.7AppointedBishop of Nice, France
8 Jul 193056.8InstalledBishop of Nice, France
23 Jan 195076.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nice, France
24 Apr 196389.6DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Jules-Narcisse Rémond:
Archbishop Paul-Jules-Narcisse Rémond (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013