Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Margarito Salazar Cárdenas

Bishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1958 Born
11 Jun 198830.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
12 Jun 198931.3Ordained PriestPriest of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
3 Mar 201860.0AppointedBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México
24 May 201860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Margarito Salazar Cárdenas
Bishop Margarito Salazar Cárdenas (born ) Bishop of Matehuala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatamoros, Diocese of Matamoros, Tamaulipas
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Matamoros, Diocese of Matamoros, Tamaulipas
Ordained PriestCathedral, Matamoros, Diocese of Matamoros, Tamaulipas
Ordained BishopCathedral, Matehuala, Diocese of Matehuala, San Luís Potosí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Matehuala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2018
  • od/loc: CB, 3 Mar 2018
  • ob: CB, 11 Mar 2018
  • c2+: CB, 24 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 May 2018

Quantcast