Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Alberto Avilés Campos, C.O.

Auxiliary Bishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Cataquas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1969 Born
1986²16.2EnteredMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
21 Jul 199828.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
10 Sep 201242.9AppointedProcurator General of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
4 Dec 201748.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brownsville, Texas, USA
4 Dec 201748.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cataquas
22 Feb 201848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cataquas

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mario Alberto Avilés Campos
Bishop Mario Alberto Avilés Campos C.O. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brownsville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMexico City, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopOur Lady of San Juan del Valle (National Shrine), Basilica, San Juan, TX, Diocese of Brownsville, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brownsville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2017
  • ob: CB, 4 Dec 2017
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jan 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast