Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Gilfillan

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1872Born
24 Jun 189523.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 192250.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
8 Jul 192250.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pegae
8 Nov 192250.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pegae
17 Mar 192351.0SucceededBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
13 Jan 193360.9DiedBishop of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Gilfillan
Bishop Francis Gilfillan (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Joseph

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAghavas (Aughavas), Ireland

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast