Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petrus Boddeng Timang

Bishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1947 Born
13 Jan 197426.5Ordained PriestPriest of Makassar, Indonesia
14 Jun 200860.9AppointedBishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia
26 Oct 200861.3Ordained BishopBishop of Banjarmasin, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Petrus Boddeng Timang
Bishop Petrus Boddeng Timang (born ) Bishop of Banjarmasin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalakri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Banjarmasin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,982

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 May 2018

Quantcast