Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Yu Soo-il, O.F.M.

Bishop of Korea, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1945 Born
197327.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
197933.7Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Feb 198034.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Jul 201065.3AppointedBishop of Korea, Military
15 Sep 201065.4Ordained BishopBishop of Korea, Military

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Yu Soo-il
Bishop Francis Xavier Yu Soo-il O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Korea, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNonsan

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Korea, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,791

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast