Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Alvin D. Ley, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus), Japan

Titular Bishop of Caput Cilla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1909Born
14 Jun 193627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Jan 194939.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus), Japan
11 Mar 196859.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
9 Jun 196859.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
24 Jan 197262.8DiedApostolic Administrator of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus), Japan

MicroData Summary for Félix Alvin D. Ley
Bishop Félix Alvin D. Ley O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHewitt, WI, USA
Ordained PriestMarathon, WI, Diocese of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
Death PlaceNaha, Apostolic Administration of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus)
Buried Place (Original)St. Clara, Church, Yonabaru-cho, Okinawa, Apostolic Administration of Okinawa and the Southern Islands (Ryukyus)

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 27 Jan 2018
  • loc: CB, 28 Jan 2018
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast