Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Richard Griffin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

Titular Bishop of Lydda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1883Born
25 May 190723.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Mar 193551.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
9 Mar 193551.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
1 May 193551.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
18 Mar 194460.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for William Richard Griffin
Bishop William Richard Griffin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of La Crosse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast