Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomás Alberto Clavel Méndez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1921BornCañazas
7 Dec 194725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Panamá
24 Jul 195533.5AppointedBishop of David, Panama
25 Sep 195533.7Ordained BishopBishop of David, Panama
3 Mar 196442.2AppointedArchbishop of Panamá
18 Dec 196846.9ResignedArchbishop of Panamá
18 Dec 196846.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Alexanum
21 Feb 197856.1ResignedTitular Archbishop of Alexanum
13 Oct 198866.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Tomás Alberto Clavel Méndez:
Archbishop Tomás Alberto Clavel Méndez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Panamá

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015