Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Henri Lévesque

Deceased

Bishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1921Born
13 Jun 194826.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 196543.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
18 Oct 196543.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Guzabeta
27 Dec 196543.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Guzabeta
17 Aug 196846.6AppointedBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
24 Nov 198462.9DiedBishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles Henri Lévesque
Bishop Charles Henri Lévesque (born , died ) Bishop of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint André de Kamouraska

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018