Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Szenczy

Deceased

Bishop of Szombathely, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1800³Born
12 Oct 182323.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Oct 182323.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 185251.9SelectedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
10 Mar 185352.4AppointedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
29 Jun 185352.7Ordained BishopBishop of Szombathely, Hungary
19 Feb 186968.4DiedBishop of Szombathely, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Szenczy (VIAF: 70042892)
Bishop Ferenc Szenczy (born , died ) Bishop of Szombathely

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzombathely

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,866
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 489
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,853, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast