Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ladislav Zábojský

Deceased

Bishop of Spiš, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1793Born
7 Jun 181623.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 185056.8SelectedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
30 Sep 185057.3ConfirmedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
25 May 185157.9Ordained BishopBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
22 Jul 185158.1InstalledBishop of Spiš, Slovakia
11 Sep 187077.2DiedBishop of Spiš, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ladislav Zábojský (VIAF: 308775914)
Bishop Ladislav Zábojský (born , died ) Bishop of Spiš

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEperjes
Ordained BishopKapuzinerkirche, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 504
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,851, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast