Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis d’Usson de Bonac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1734BornSolothurn, Switzerland
1 Nov 176733.7SelectedBishop of Agen, France
25 Jan 176833.9ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
14 Feb 176834.0Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
30 Oct 176834.7InstalledBishop of Agen, France
1816¹81.9ResignedBishop of Agen, France
11 Mar 182187.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis d’Usson de Bonac:
Bishop Jean-Louis d’Usson de Bonac (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agen

  • a bishop for 53.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015